Sharkey et al v. Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Janai Sharkey and Jack Sharkey
Defendant: Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC d/b/a Lifestyle Health Plans and Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00615
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Layna C. Rush for Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC replacing William W. Sentell, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Substitute Layna Rush in place of William Sentell as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Layna Rush in place of William Sentell as Attorney by Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sentell, William)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Sentell, William)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Vacating #4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/23/2019. (EDC)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC answer due 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages by Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sentell, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District - East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-686456. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2001107), filed by Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC d/b/a Lifestyle Health Plans. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Pleading, #3 Attachment State Court Pleading)(Sentell, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharkey et al v. Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC d/b/a Lifestyle Health Plans
Represented By: William W. Sentell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medova Healthcare Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: William W. Sentell, III
Represented By: Layna C. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janai Sharkey
Represented By: Keith P. Richards
Represented By: Steven James Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Sharkey
Represented By: Keith P. Richards
Represented By: Steven James Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?