Allen v. H&M Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ivan Allen
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company, Eric Motz and H&M Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00616
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2020. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 12/15/2019. Discovery due by 6/30/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/29/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 6/30/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/31/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/31/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 10/30/2020. Motions shall be filed by 11/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/26/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/30/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 5/21/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/28/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2021 - 6/17/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/8/2019. (SGO)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Ivan Allen. (Bateman, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by H&M Trucking, Inc., Eric Motz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Trahan, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Consent to Removal by Eric Motz. (Trahan, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Eric Motz.(Trahan, Kevin) Modified on 10/15/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H&M Trucking, Inc.. (Trahan, Kevin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED and CONSOLIATED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs, filed by H&M Trucking, Inc..(Trahan, Kevin) Modified on 10/11/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
October 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 10/15/2019, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendant Eric Motz, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/2/2019. (SGO)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (SGO)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Ivan Allen. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Bateman, David)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney K. Wade Trahan regarding Michael C. Wynne who is Co-Counsel for party H & M Trucking, Inc & Eric Motz. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by H&M Trucking, Inc..(Trahan, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from East Baton Rouge Parish Clerk of Court, Case Number 686867. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2001268), filed by H&M Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Verification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trahan, Kevin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/17/2019)to edit page orientation (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. H&M Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Allen
Represented By: David Bateman
Represented By: John Michael McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Motz
Represented By: Kevin Wade Trahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&M Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Wade Trahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?