August J. Levert Jr. Family, LLC et al v. BP America Production Company
Plaintiff: James L. Sanford, Paul M. Levert, Campo E. Matens, Mark W. Levert, Jr., John E. Sanford, August J. Levert, Family, LLC, Ronald R. Levert and August J. Levert Jr. Family, LLC
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00623
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Remand filed by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KMW)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition in Excess of 10 Pages to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by BP America Production Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/13/2019. (KMW)
November 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition in Excess of 10 Pages to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition in Excess of 10 Pages to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Memo in Opposition, #3 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 1)(Troutman, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #9 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 1-O, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-P - 1-CC)(Bartlett, Harvey)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Record Document 1-4. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Doc. 1-4 with 7-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion to Substitute Record Document 1-4 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Record Document 1-4 by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Record Document 1-4)(Troutman, John) Modified to edit text on 10/17/2019 (BLR).
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Affirmative Defenses, Jury and Trial Demand ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by BP America Production Company. (Troutman, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C. for BP America Production Company.. (Troutman, John)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/24/2019. (ELW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Entered in error by the Case Administrator (EDC). Modified on 9/20/2019 (NLT).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Gladestone Jones regarding Kevin E. Huddell and John T. Arnold who is Co-Counsel for party August J. Levert Jr. Family LLC et al. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial District Court, Parish of Iberville, Case Number 78953. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2002860), filed by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages and Citation, #2 Exhibit 2 - BP's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial and Request for Statutory Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jurisdictional Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs on behalf of BP, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs' Responses to BP's Jurisdictional Discovery Requests, #5 Exhibit 5 - BP's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests, #6 Exhibit 6 - Motion to Set Scheduling Conference, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Setting Scheduling Conference for August 28, 2019, #8 Exhibit 8 - Joint Motion to Re-Set Scheduling Conference, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Setting Scheduling Conference for October 2, 2019, #10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Return Receipt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Clerk's Fax Filing Confirmation of Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages, #12 Exhibit 12 - Clerk's Fax Filing Confirmation of BP's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial, #13 Exhibit 13 - Minute Entry Continuing Scheduling Conference to October 2, 2019, #14 Exhibit 14 - Notice of Service of Petition for Damages, #15 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #16 Attachment Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #17 Attachment Notice of Removal to State Court)(Troutman, John) (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/18/2019) (ELW). Modified on 10/18/2019 as ordered by rec doc #8 (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: August J. Levert Jr. Family, LLC et al v. BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Sanford
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Levert
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campo E. Matens
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W. Levert, Jr.
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Sanford
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August J. Levert, Family, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R. Levert
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August J. Levert Jr. Family, LLC
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Harvey S. Bartlett, III
Represented By: Bernard E. Boudreaux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: John Seth Troutman
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Court Charles VanTassell
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?