Batiste v. Shintech Louisiana LLC
Plaintiff: James Batiste
Defendant: Shintech Louisiana LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00624
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Plead and to Continue Scheduling Conference. Defendant Shintech Louisiana LLC is granted an extension of twenty-one (21) days, or until 12/4/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 is RESET to 1/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. A Status Report shall be filed on or before 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
October 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Plead and to Continue Scheduling Conference MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shintech Louisiana LLC identifying Corporate Parent CK-Tech, Inc., Corporate Parent Shintech, Inc., Corporate Parent Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. for Shintech Louisiana LLC.. (Bremenstul, Minia)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Plead and to Continue Scheduling Conference by Shintech Louisiana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bremenstul, Minia) Modified on 10/25/2019 to edit text (LT).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (SGO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shintech Louisiana LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shintech Louisiana LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2002963.), filed by James Batiste. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Blackman, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batiste v. Shintech Louisiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shintech Louisiana LLC
Represented By: Sidney F. Lewis, V
Represented By: Minia E Bremenstul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Batiste
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?