In re: Ascension RV & Boat Storage, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Talbot
Defendant: Joanna Koong
In Re: Ascension RV & Boat Storage, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00661
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Joanna Koong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B)(Sexton, R. Gray)
October 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Robert Talbot. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Skias, Anna)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (SGO)
October 1, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In re: Ascension RV & Boat Storage, Case Number 126541. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2008950), filed by Joanna Koong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 List of Parties and Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 Notice of Filing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Balance Sheet re Jurisdictional Amount, #6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Sexton, R. Gray) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/1/2019) (EDC). Modified on 10/1/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Ascension RV & Boat Storage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ascension RV & Boat Storage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Talbot
Represented By: Anna Quintero Skias
Represented By: Robert Ryland Percy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Koong
Represented By: Alesia Mottle Ardoin
Represented By: R. Gray Sexton
Represented By: Blane Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?