Williams v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Reginald Williams
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00663
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald Williams. Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mugrabi, Evian)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC is granted an extension of 21 days, or until 12/11/2019, to file an answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 19, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elmer, Kaja)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/18/2019. (KAH) Modified on 10/21/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
October 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Damages for Violation of ECOA against Nationstar Mortgage LLC, filed by Reginald Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibits, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Affidavit IFP Application)(Mugrabi, Evian) Modified on 10/2/2019 to edit text. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Williams
Represented By: Evian Mugrabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Angelina Christina
Represented By: Kaja Stamnes Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?