Weary v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc
Plaintiff: Daphne Weary
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc. and Daphne C Weary
Case Number: 3:2019cv00666
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (NLT)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER approving #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Daphne Weary. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
November 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daphne Weary (Wilson, J.)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/4/2019. (BLR)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Daphne Weary against Lumber Liquidators, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2009536.), filed by Daphne C Weary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, J.) Modified on 10/2/2019 to edit text (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weary v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne C Weary
Represented By: J. Courtney Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Weary
Represented By: J. Courtney Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?