Reece v. Hamm et al
Plaintiff: Donald Chester Reece
Defendant: Norman Weiss, Carlen Bourgeois, Kevin K. McAleenan, David P. Pekoske, Kimberly Hamm and Rebecca DeMarco
Case Number: 3:2019cv00669
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Kinney, Ellen)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donald Chester Reece. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Varrecchio, Dominic)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #9 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Kinney, Ellen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kinney, Ellen)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Ex Parte MOTION to File Corrected U.S. Code USC 1447 Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Docs. 5 and 5-1 with R. Docs. 7-2 and 7-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion, Memorandum, Submission and Proposed Order . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION to File Corrected U.S. Code USC 1447 Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Donald Chester Reece. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;, #5 Proposed Pleading;)(Varrecchio, Dominic) Modified on 10/25/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #5 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 is CANCELED. Not status report is due. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Donald Chester Reece. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Varrecchio, Dominic) (Main Document 5 and Attachment 1 replaced on 10/28/2019) (EDC). Modified on 10/28/2019 in accordance with record document 8. (EDC).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/4/2019. (BLR)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States now has until October 30, 2019 to file responsive pleadings on behalf of the namedand served Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/2/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Kinney, Ellen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by the United States from 19th JDC, Case Number C-687447. (), filed by Kimberly Hamm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Index of State Court Record), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Record), #3 Exhibit C (Declaration of Arden Hudson), #4 Exhibit D (Certification by U.S. Attorney), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinney, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reece v. Hamm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Weiss
Represented By: Ellen Miletello Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlen Bourgeois
Represented By: Ellen Miletello Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Ellen Miletello Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Pekoske
Represented By: Ellen Miletello Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Hamm
Represented By: Ellen Miletello Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca DeMarco
Represented By: Ellen Miletello Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Chester Reece
Represented By: Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio, First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?