Kling v. Hebert et al
Plaintiff: Randall Kling
Defendant: Troy Hebert, Juana Marine Lombard and Juana Marine-Lombard
Case Number: 3:2019cv00671
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Juana Marine-Lombard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The #7 Motion forExtension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Defendant Juana-Marine Lombard ishereby GRANTED and the deadline to file responsive pleadings be reset to November 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Juana Marine-Lombard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randall Kling. Juana Marine-Lombard served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Smith, J.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Smith, J.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Smith, J.)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/4/2019. (BLR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Randall Kling. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2010418) (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Smith, J.) Modified on 10/3/2019 to add payment information.(EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kling v. Hebert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Kling
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Marine Lombard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Marine-Lombard
Represented By: Renee Culotta
Represented By: Benjamin M. Castoriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?