Lee v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jerone Lee
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and NRG Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00673
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Motion to Vacate Orders and Reset Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Vacate Orders and Reset Deadlines by Jerone Lee. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Carter, Robert) Modified on 11/26/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerone Lee. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Carter, Robert)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ERISA Case Order: In order to facilitate an efficient progression of this action, the parties shall comply with the deadlines stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2019. (BLR)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/4/2019. (BLR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2010582.), filed by Jerone Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons)(Carter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerone Lee
Represented By: Jessica C. Ledet
Represented By: Robert J. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?