Hammond v. Protective Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Hammond
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company and Progressive Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00682
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Rimes, Robert)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Partial Dismissal. All claims asserted against Progressive Security Insurance Company are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/30/2019. (KAH)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Daniel Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Rimes, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to Removal by Daniel Hammond (Rimes, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM Supporting Amount in Controversy For Removal filed by Protective Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16)(Breaux, Ralph) Modified on 10/22/2019 to edit text (LT).
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protective Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Protective Insurance Corporation for Protective Insurance Company.. (Breaux, Ralph)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 10/21/2019, Defendant Protective Insurance Company shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met. On or before 11/1/2019, Plaintiff Daniel Hammond shall address the citizenship issue of Defendant Progressive Security Insurance Company. On or before 11/1/2019, Plaintiff Daniel Hammond shall address the amount in controversy issue. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/9/2019. (KAH)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/8/2019. (SWE) Modified on 10/8/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Kaye C. Templet regarding Donna Johnson, Sean P. Rabalias, Leah M. Penny, and S. Curtis Mitchell who are Co-Counsel for party Progressive Security Insurance Company. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit the text (KMW).
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 677974. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2011599), filed by Protective Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Certificate of Filing of State Court Record, #17 Exhibit A-State Court Record)(Breaux, Ralph) (Attachments 9, 15, and 17 replaced on 10/7/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Protective Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hammond
Represented By: Randall Lee Daquanno, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Luke Melancon
Represented By: Robert C. Rimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Ralph Gerard Breaux
Represented By: Cory Thomas Stuart
Represented By: James H. Johnson
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron J. Lawler
Represented By: Kaye C. Templet
Represented By: Steven Kyle Landrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?