Weary v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc
Plaintiff: Daphne Weary
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00698
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (BLR)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes Status Report is due 2/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) Modified to edit text on 11/25/2019 (BLR).
November 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Amend #4 Order Transferring Case to Another District MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Lumber Liquidators Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Desmond, Susan) Modified on 11/21/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2019. (ELW)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12885. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #3 motion to transfer is GRANTED. Case transferred to Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/10/2019.(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/11/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Louisiana by Daphne Weary. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Wilson, John) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (pp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/11/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/11/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lumber Liquidators,Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7879740) filed by Daphne Weary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Courtney Wilson added to party Daphne Weary(pty:pla).(Wilson, John) Modified on 10/1/2019: WITHHOLD SUMMONS (clw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weary v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators Inc.
Represented By: Susan Fahey Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Weary
Represented By: J. Courtney Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?