Turner v. International Business Machines Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carole Turner
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation and Vivek Arya
Case Number: 3:2019cv00706
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Request for Trial by Jury by The Hertz Corporation.(Kaplan, Howard) Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/24/2019. (SGO)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Vivek Arya, International Business Machines Corporation.(Mathews, Kellen) Modified on 10/22/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 688137. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2015317), filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mathews, Kellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. International Business Machines Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Howard Bruce Kaplan
Represented By: Stephen N. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Justin Alan Jack
Represented By: Grant Joseph Guillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek Arya
Represented By: Justin Alan Jack
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Grant Joseph Guillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Turner
Represented By: Douglas K. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?