Robert v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Robert
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC, Wright National Flood Insurance Company and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00712
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2020. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 12/19/2019. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 2/3/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 2/10/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 3/2/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 3/16/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 3/31/2020. Motions shall be filed by 4/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 9/24/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 10/15/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 10/30/2020. Bench Trial set for 11/9/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/12/2019. (SGO)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Substitute Pleading. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 10 with R. Doc. 11-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Joint Status Report by Michael Paul Robert. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Status Report to be Substituted)(Skias, Anna)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Michael Paul Robert. (Skias, Anna) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/10/2019 in accordance with RD 12) (SWE).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 and #8 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Joel W. Morgan and Theodore I. Brenner are enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for defendant Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
November 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Theodore I. Brenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2036001). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
November 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Joel W. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2035990). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Theodore I. Brenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2036001) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Oath in Support, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pousson-Vorhaben, Tessa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joel W. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2035990) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Oath in Support, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pousson-Vorhaben, Tessa)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 09:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/24/2019. (SGO)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Original ANSWER to Complaint by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC.(Gutierrez, Melissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright National Flood Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown, Inc. for Wright National Flood Insurance Company.. (Pousson-Vorhaben, Tessa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Petition) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company.(Pousson-Vorhaben, Tessa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Documents by Wright National Flood Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Pousson-Vorhaben, Tessa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF A CIVIL ACTION from 23rd Judicial District Court, Case Number 00126748E. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2016784), filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Written Consent, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Pousson-Vorhaben, Tessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Robert
Represented By: Robert Ryland Percy, III
Represented By: Anna Quintero Skias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright National Flood Insurance Company
Represented By: Tessa Maria Pousson-Vorhaben
Represented By: Theodore I Brenner
Represented By: Joel W. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?