McCoy v. SC Tiger Manor, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lydia McCoy
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc., IQ Data Int., Inc., SC Tiger Manor, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00723
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The U. S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found.(ELW)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/21/2019. (BLR)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summons submitted to the USM for service (ELW)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U. S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/18/2019. (ELW) Modified on 10/22/2019 to add summons language (ELW).
October 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Lydia McCoy. (KMW)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., IQ Data Int., Inc., SC Tiger Manor, LLC, filed by Lydia McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. SC Tiger Manor, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data Int., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Tiger Manor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?