White v. Paychex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher White
Defendant: Paychex Inc. and Paychex North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00735
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference is set for 12/12/2019 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/10/2019. (ELW)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paychex North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Keenan, Christine)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paychex North America, Inc., filed by Christopher White.(SWE)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint filed by Christopher White. The Clerk of Court shall docket R. Doc. 7-2 into the record, which shall become the operative complaint in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by no later than December 13, 2019, Paychex Inc. shall file a motion to withdraw the pending #3 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Damages as the operative complaint has changed. The withdrawal is without prejudice to refiling a Motion to Dismiss related to the operative complaint should Paychex Inc. choose to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
December 9, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Bernard, G.) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Christopher White. (Bernard, G.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christopher White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Bernard, G.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paychex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 EEOC Charge, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Keenan, Christine)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/29/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/24/2019. (BLR)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 686,106. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2021218), filed by Paychex North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Removal Exhibits w State Court Record)(Keenan, Christine) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/24/2019) (EDC). Modified on 10/24/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Paychex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher White
Represented By: G. Karl Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paychex Inc.
Represented By: M. Rebecca Cooper
Represented By: Christine S. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paychex North America, Inc.
Represented By: M. Rebecca Cooper
Represented By: Christine S. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?