Thomas v. Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Russell Thomas
Defendant: Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation and Johnny J Alfred
Case Number: 3:2019cv00741
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation, filed by Russell Thomas.(Curtis, Tracy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder- Doomes: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/9/2019. The parties discussed the failure to comply with the Court's 10/31/2019 Order. Plaintiff Russell Thomas shall file an Amended Complaint deleting all claims against Johnny J. Alfred by no later than 12/20/2019. (KAH)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause for failure to comply with the Court's #5 Order. Show Cause Hearing before the Magistrate Judge set for 12/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. In lieu of appearing, plaintiff shall comply with the Court's #5 Order by 12/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation.(Whitworth, Adam)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 4-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) Modified on 11/1/2019 to edit text (LLH).
November 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On on or before November 22, 2019, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a Motion to Remand based on lack of subject matter jurisdiction, addressing the alleged improper joinder of Johnny J. Alfred (Alfred); or (2) an Amended Complaint deleting all claims against Alfred. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/31/2019. (NLT)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Whitworth, Adam)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/31/2019. (BLR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation. (Whitworth, Adam)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial District Court, Case Number 79351. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2024506), filed by Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitworth, Adam) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/4/2019 in accordance with RD 6) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritas Life Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Adam David Whitworth
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny J Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Thomas
Represented By: Tracy P. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?