Bias v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Bias
Defendant: Carl J Foster and John B Wells
Case Number: 3:2019cv00743
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Notice and Order: Regarding the #5 Motion to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff, Ronald Bias, IT IS ORDERED that by no later than January 6, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a Motion to substitute the proposed Amended Complaint in this matter with a proposed comprehensive pleading that includes all of Plaintiffs numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, and which will become the operative complaint in this matter without reference to any other document in the record. The Clerk of Court shall serve this Order on Ronald Bias at the address listed on PACER via certified mail return receipt requested. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) Modified on 12/23/2019 to indicate certified mail info for R. Bias - Tracking No 7004 1160 0003 2648 1265 (NLT).
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , and #6 Reply to Response to Motion by Ronald Bias. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(KMW)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John B Wells. (Archey, Connell)
December 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Amend Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Ronald Bias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Attachment)(KMW)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) /MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by John B Wells. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibits 1 thru 7, #3 Exhibits 8 thru 25)(Archey, Connell) Modified on 11/12/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/05/2019. (ELW)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court,EBR, LA, Case Number C-687496. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2025264), filed by John B Wells. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment List of State Court Pleadings, #3 Attachment List of All Counsel of Record)(Archey, Connell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bias v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Wells
Represented By: Connell Lee Archey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Bias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?