Bussey v. Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael D. Bussey
Defendant: Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00782
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/8/2020. (SGO)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Defenses to #1 Complaint by Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc.(Kilgore, Erin) Modified on 12/27/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 and #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys William Liles and Lindsay R. Itkin are enrolled as pro hace vice co-counsel for Plaintiff Michael D. Bussey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Lindsay R. Itkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043950) by Michael D. Bussey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for William Liles to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043892) by Michael D. Bussey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
December 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for William Liles to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043892). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Lindsay R. Itkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2043950). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Michael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael A. Josephson is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Plaintiff Michael D. Bussey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendant Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc. is granted an extension of 21 days, or until 12/27/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Michael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2041982) by Michael D. Bussey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 12/6/2019 to edit text (LT). Modified on 12/6/2019 (NLT).
December 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2041982). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Kilgore, Erin) Modified on 12/6/2019 to edit text (LT).
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael D. Bussey. Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Bohrer, Philip)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2031289.), filed by Michael D. Bussey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons)(Bohrer, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussey v. Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Technical Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Lutkewitte Kilgore
Represented By: Scott D. Huffstetler
Represented By: Chelsea Gomez Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Bussey
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Lindsay R. Itkin
Represented By: Michael Josephson
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?