Specialized Industrial Maintenance, Inc. v. APTIM Maintenance, LLC
Plaintiff: Specialized Industrial Maintenance, Inc.
Defendant: APTIM Maintenance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00804
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by APTIM Maintenance, LLC.(Funes, Kelsey)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/25/2019. (EDC)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney David Sinnott Bland regarding Allison R. Colon who is Co-Counsel for party Specialized Industrial Maintenance, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 689491. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2034872), filed by APTIM Maintenance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Counsel, #4 Exhibit 3 - List of Parties and Counsel, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Funes, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Specialized Industrial Maintenance, Inc. v. APTIM Maintenance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APTIM Maintenance, LLC
Represented By: Kelsey Kornick Funes
Represented By: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Anthony J. Gambino, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda W. Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Specialized Industrial Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: David Sinnott Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?