St. Johns United Methodist Church v. The Hanover Insurance Company
Plaintiff: St. Johns United Methodist Church
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00816
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to appropriate judicial district court). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/17/2019. (SWE)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Remand by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Order)(Viator, Margaret)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (SGO)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-689643. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2036873), filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record)(Viator, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Johns United Methodist Church v. The Hanover Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Margaret Anne Viator
Represented By: Mark Charles Dodart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Johns United Methodist Church
Represented By: R. Gray Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?