Cook v. Craus et al
Plaintiff: Brian Cook
Defendant: Albert Erwin Craus, Jr. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00835
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Brian Cook. (Campbell, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Brian Cook, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Albert Erwin Craus, Jr.(Brumfield, Brad)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (SGO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Albert Erwin Craus, Jr, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Brumfield, Brad)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Brumfield, Brad)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 690668. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2038799), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Albert Erwin Craus, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court pleading, #2 Exhibit Memorial Hospital bill, #3 Exhibit Acadian Ambulance lien, #4 Exhibit civil cover sheet)(Brumfield, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Craus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Cook
Represented By: Robert Leonard Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Erwin Craus, Jr.
Represented By: Brad Jeremy Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brad Jeremy Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?