Willcutt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brenda Willcutt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00854
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Letter dated December 21, 2019 from Brenda Willcutt to Clerk's Office Re: Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (EDC)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. The plaintiff has money available in checking account to pay filing fee. The plaintiff is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/08/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda Willcutt. (KMW)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Brenda Willcutt. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Attachment)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willcutt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Willcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?