Rowe v. Primerica Life Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Donald Rowe
Defendant: Chris Dantin, Chris Dantin Inc, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America and Primerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00863
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Remand filed by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Malish, Amy)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Trapolin, Edward)
January 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 MOTION to Sever Due to Misjoinder. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Sever Due to Misjoinder by Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Trapolin, Edward)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance by Chris Dantin Inc, Chris Dantin, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 M, #14 Exhibit N)(Malish, Amy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America.(Malish, Amy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #12 Motion to Remand, good cause exists to defer entry of a scheduling order in this matter. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2020 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 9, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(LaHatte, Joseph)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting and denying in part the #10 Motion to Enroll Counsel of Record. Added attorney Joseph F. LaHatte, III for Donald Rowe. The motion is denied as to enrolling Jennifer Zajac for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(5)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 7, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Joseph F. LaHatte III and Jennifer Zajac as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Enroll Joseph F. LaHatte III and Jennifer Zajac as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(LaHatte, Joseph)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/2/2020. (KAH)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Primerica Life Insurance Company.(Trapolin, Edward)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 1/8/2020, Plaintiff shall file either a Motion to Remand or Amended Complaint as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/18/2019. (SWE)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a). The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America be, and herebyis, granted an extension of time of twenty-one (21) days within which to file responsive pleadings,or an extension of time through January 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Primerica Life Insurance Company (Trapolin, Edward)
December 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pelleteri, Maura)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Pelleteri, Maura)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Edward W. Trapolin regarding Laura Legette who is Co-Counsel for party Primerica Life Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-690491. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2046186), filed by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Pelleteri, Maura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Primerica Life Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Dantin
Represented By: Amy M. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Dantin Inc
Represented By: Amy M. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Maura Zivalich Pelleteri
Represented By: Amy M. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Rowe
Represented By: Joseph F. LaHatte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?