AMJ Transport Corp. et al v. BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: AMJ Transport Corp. and Alsee Moore, Jr.
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00893
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: In light of the Judge Reassignment (R. Doc. 3), the Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes is CANCELED. The hearing will be reset for a later date. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) by BMO Harris Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(deBarros, Michael) Modified on 2/20/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2020-03, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(DGM)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/07/2020. (ELW)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2051459.), filed by AMJ Transport Corp., Alsee Moore. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cover Sheet)(Holt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMJ Transport Corp. et al v. BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Katilyn M. Hollowell
Represented By: Michael Jason deBarros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMJ Transport Corp.
Represented By: James S. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alsee Moore, Jr.
Represented By: James S. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?