United States of America v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Freddie J Campbell, Progressive Waste Solutions of LA, Inc. and Ace American Insurance Company
Interested Party: Christopher Brinson
Case Number: 3:2019mc00113
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (KAH)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Quash Subpoena. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to close this miscellaneous action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/29/2019. (KAH)
September 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Civil Subpoena for Deposition, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of Thomas J. Blum)(Green, Katherine)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America (Green, Katherine) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/6/2019 to flatten the document) (KMW).
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Subpoena Proceedings from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 662234. (), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie J Campbell
Represented By: Rachel Michelle Roe
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Waste Solutions of LA, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Michelle Roe
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Rachel Michelle Roe
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Katherine Krupa Green
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Christopher Brinson
Represented By: Hester Ruth Dornan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?