Blackmon et al v. Bracken Construction Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ted Mario Blackmon
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Anthony Ver Meer, Ruthie Blackmon, Bracken Construction Company, Inc., Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company, Jhon Evelio Jaramillo and C3 Construction Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019mc00124
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #1 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
September 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-mc-12248. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Transfer Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoena. Case transferred to Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 9/16/2019.(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Transfer Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoena by Bracken Construction Company, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Philip G. Watson added to party Bracken Construction Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Watson, Philip) Modified on 9/13/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service of #5 Order served on Bracken Construction Company, Inc. on 9/9/2019(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the submission date of Plaintiffs' #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena is RESET to September 18, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition to Plaintiffs' #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena shall be filed no later than Friday, September 13, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Ted Mario Blackmon's enrolled counsel of record are to provide the Court with evidence of service upon Defendant Bracken Construction Company, Inc., at the address noticed below no later than 10 days of the signing of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(cc: Bracken Construction Co., Inc. via certified mail)(mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (mp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To ensure that all parties have been noticed properly, the Court will reset the submission date and direct the Clerk's Office to mail the motion and this Order to the person who issued or requested the subpoena. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date of the #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena is RESET to 9/11/2019 before the undersigned Chief Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc Motion & Order: Bracken Construction Company, Inc.)(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing fee received from Eulis Simien: Receipt LAE057474 $47 (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Submission by Ted Blackmon re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. (Bergeron, Roy) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Ted Blackmon. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)Attorney Roy L. Bergeron, Jr added to party Ted Mario Blackmon(pty:pla).(Bergeron, Roy) (Main Document 1 and Attachments 1 and 2 replaced on 8/22/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 8/22/2019 (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #6 Notice of Submission (Civil Only)) (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/17/2019.] Modified on 9/17/2019 to change termination date (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmon et al v. Bracken Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ver Meer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruthie Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracken Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Philip G. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhon Evelio Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C3 Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Mario Blackmon
Represented By: Jimmy Simien
Represented By: Eulis Simien, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Louis Bergeron, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?