Martin v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Wade Martin
Defendant: Bayer AG and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00007
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Northern District of California. (SWE)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO)(SWE)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (SWE)
January 7, 2020 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Simien and Simien LLC in the amount of $400.00. Transaction posted on 1/6/2020. Receipt number 4699029997 processed by kwilcox. (TDA)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400 Receipt Number ALAMDC 469902999), filed by Wade Martin.(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?