Gardner v. Latin et al
Plaintiff: Marven Gardner
Defendant: Bianca Tyree Latin, Lyndon Southern Insurance Company and Kia Motors America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00015
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the #9 MOTION to Withdraw Removal and Consent to Remand, filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. be GRANTED and that this matter be REMANDED to the 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because Plaintiff and properly joined defendant Bianca Tyree Latin are citizens of Louisiana and there is no basis for the exercise of federal subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 02/25/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(EWD)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to USMJ: #9 MOTION to Withdraw Removal and Consent to Remand filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BKA)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw Removal and Consent to Remand by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Maxwell, Robert)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 Telephone Conference Report and Order/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 1/27/2020. Parties discussed #3 Motion to Remand. By Thursday, February 6, 2020, Defendant, Kia Motors America, Inc., shall file either (1) a notice of its intention to proceed with removal and opposition to remand, or (2) a motion to withdraw its Notice of Removal, consenting to remand. (EDC)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Maxwell, Robert)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A telephone conference is set for 01/27/2020, at 1:30 PM to discuss the #3 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/23/2020. (EDC) Modified on 1/24/2020 to edit the text (NLT).
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Vacating #4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER in light of the pending #3 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/15/2020. (KAH)
January 10, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Marven Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A")(Johnson, Willie)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kia Motors America Inc. (Maxwell, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 691032. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2055607), filed by Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment)(Maxwell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Latin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianca Tyree Latin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndon Southern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marven Gardner
Represented By: Jennifer Robinson
Represented By: Willie G Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Derek Edward Elsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?