Bracken v. Welborn, et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Bracken
Defendant: Doug Welborn
Case Number: 3:2020cv00072
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) by Doug Welborn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/24/2020. (KAH)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Partial Dismissal filed by Doug Welborn. (SWE)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Doug Welborn. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/11/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal by Doug Welborn. (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal, #2 Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Partial Dismissal filed by Barbara Bracken. (Craft, Jill)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2020-03, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Doug Welborn.(Culotta, Renee)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Doug Welborn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Culotta, Renee)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2070350), filed by Doug Welborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culotta, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bracken v. Welborn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bracken
Represented By: Jill L Craft
Represented By: William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Welborn
Represented By: Renee Culotta
Represented By: Benjamin M. Castoriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?