Belfor USA Group, Inc v. Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School et al
Plaintiff: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish School System and Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School
Case Number: 3:2020cv00096
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Enroll John W. Bihm as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Enroll John W. Bihm as Additional Attorney by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order)(LeMieux, Christopher)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by East Baton Rouge Parish School System (Blunt, Shelton)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (LeMieux, Christopher)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 There is no record document 9. Entered in error by case administrator (KMW).
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Williams, Graham)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. East Baton Rouge Parish School System waiver sent on 3/16/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (LeMieux, Christopher)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED and Restated COMPLAINT against Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School, East Baton Rouge Parish School System, filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc..(LeMieux, Christopher) Modified on 3/5/2020 to edit text (LT).
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On or before 3/10/2020, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of plaintiff and defendants by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/2/2020. (EDC)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 4/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/24/2020. (SGO)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School, East Baton Rouge Parish School System. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/20/2020 to edit summons) (LT).
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Christopher K. LeMieux regarding John W. Bihm who is Co-Counsel for party Belfor USA Group. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School (d/b/a Democracy Prep Baton Rouge Charter School), East Baton Rouge Parish School System ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2076870.), filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc. d/b/a Belfor Property Restoration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons to Democracy Prep, #3 Attachment Summons to East Baton Rouge Parish School System)(LeMieux, Christopher) (Attachment 2 and 3 replaced on 2/19/2020 to flatten documents) (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belfor USA Group, Inc v. Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belfor USA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Evian Mugrabi
Represented By: Christopher K LeMieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democracy Prep Louisiana Charter School
Represented By: Graham Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?