Georgetown Home Owners Association, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507 et al
Plaintiff: Georgetown Home Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: Blumberg and Associates, Inc. and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507
Case Number: 3:2020cv00102
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Record Document #5 , Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507 (hereinafter "Certain Underwriters") et. al. by Georgetown Home Owners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(LaHatte, Joseph) Modified on 4/20/2020 to edit text (LT).
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , To Sever and Dismiss Claims Against Underwriters MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , To Sever and Dismiss Claims Against Underwriters or Alternatively, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A", Part 1, Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit "A", Part 2, Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit "B", 02/20/2020 Letter)(Dodd, Virginia). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/1/2020 to edit text (LT).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 5/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/24/2020. (KAH)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental and AMENDING ANSWER to Petition for Damages and Affirmative Defenses #1 Notice of Removal,, by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507. (Dodd, Virginia) Modified on 3/4/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint Petition for Damages and Affirmative Defenses by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507.(Dodd, Virginia)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 691883. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2079228), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit 3 - Insurance Policy Part 1, #5 Exhibit 3 - Insurance Policy Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4 - Consent to Removal)(Dodd, Virginia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgetown Home Owners Association, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgetown Home Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer D. Zajac
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Joseph F. LaHatte, III
Represented By: Trent Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blumberg and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Max J. Cohen
Represented By: Melanie Lockett
Represented By: Abigail Frank Gerrity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Severally Subscribing to Policy Number AMR-60507
Represented By: Virginia Yoder Dodd
Represented By: Kate B Mire
Represented By: Kevin William Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?