Gammon v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: George Gammon, Jr.
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00109
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Dudley, Peter)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.. (Chassaignac, Charles)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Chassaignac, Charles)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile InsuranceCompany be granted additional time in which to answer and file responsive pleadings with saidpleadings to be filed on or before March 25, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 27, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Chassaignac, Charles)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/27/2020. (BLR)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of List of Parties and Copies of Pleadings and Service in Compliance with 28 USC Section 1447 (b) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chassaignac, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-692982. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2080358), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Chassaignac, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gammon v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Eleanor Weeks Wall
Represented By: Justin Murphy DeLaune
Represented By: Kellye Rosenzweig Grinton
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gammon, Jr.
Represented By: Peter T. Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?