Varrecchio v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rachel Varrecchio
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00154
Filed: March 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendant having not made and appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/17/2020. (EDC)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing Fee $400, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2089394) by Rachel Varrecchio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varrecchio v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Varrecchio
Represented By: Dominic Nicholas Varrecchio, First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?