Perrin v. State of Louisiana et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Perrin
Defendant: State of Louisiana and Department of Transportation and Development
Intervenor Plaintiff: Jean Boudreaux, Peggy Barringer, Janice Hyde, Carol Morse, Devonna Milton and William Derbins
Case Number: 3:2020cv00165
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion to Extend Scheduling Conference Deadlines. IT IS ORDERED that the scheduling conference in this matter previously scheduled for May 28, 2020, be and it is hereby cancelled. It is further ordered that a scheduling conference shall beheld on July 9, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. The parties shall submit a status report no laterthan June 25, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 12, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extend Scheduling Conference Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extend Scheduling Conference Deadlines by Department of Transportation and Development. (Philips, Harry) Modified on 5/12/2020 to edit text (LT).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Harry Joseph Philips, Jr. and Caroline Kay Darwin for Department of Transportation and Development and for State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/1/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 11, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Harry J. Philips, Jr. and Caroline Darwin as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Enroll Harry J. Philips, Jr. and Caroline Darwin as Attorney by Department of Transportation and Development. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Philips, Harry)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT of Intervention against State of Louisiana and Department of Transportation and Development, filed by Jean Boudreaux, William Derbins, Carol Morse, Peggy Barringer, Janice Hyde, Devonna Milton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(EDC)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/8/2020. (EDC)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Nowak, Eric)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Nowak, Eric)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Nowak, Eric)
April 1, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene by Jean-Paul Layrisson, Henry G. Terhoeve, Calvin C. Fayard, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Layrisson, Jean-Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/2/2020) (KMW). (Attachments 3 & 4 replaced on 4/2/2020 to correct page orientation) (KMW).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 03/23/2020. (ELW)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of summons for John Bel Edwards, Governor; Jeff Landry, Attorney General; and Dr. Shawn Wilson. The named persons/entities are not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (EDC)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Equal Protection against Department of Transportation and Development and the State of Louisiana ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2091187.), filed by Joseph Perrin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons LA Gov, #3 Attachment Summons LA AG, #4 Attachment Summons LA DOTD)(Nowak, Eric) Modified on 3/19/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/19/2020) (EDC). Modified on 3/19/2020 to flatten documents. (EDC). Modified on 3/19/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrin v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation and Development
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Perrin
Represented By: Eric R. Nowak
Represented By: Byard Edwards, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jean Boudreaux
Represented By: Jean-Paul Layrisson
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Peggy Barringer
Represented By: Jean-Paul Layrisson
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Janice Hyde
Represented By: Jean-Paul Layrisson
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carol Morse
Represented By: Jean-Paul Layrisson
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Devonna Milton
Represented By: Jean-Paul Layrisson
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: William Derbins
Represented By: Jean-Paul Layrisson
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?