Endurance American Insurance Company v. ABG Caulking Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Endurance American Insurance Company
Defendant: The Roof Depot 002, Inc., ABG Caulking Contractors, Inc., Miller Masonry, LLC, Southern Coating Systems, Inc., RD&M, Inc., Triad Mechanical Company, Inc., Caragher, Inc., ABC Caulking Contractors, Inc. and Southeastern Coating Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00174
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Insurance Company. RD&M, Inc. served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Teske, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Southeastern Coating Systems, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Submitted (Teske, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Insurance Company. ABC Caulking Contractors, Inc. served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Teske, Christopher)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Insurance Company. Miller Masonry, LLC served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Teske, Christopher)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to ABC Caulking Contractors, Inc., Caragher, Inc., Miller Masonry, LLC, RD&M, Inc., Southeastern Coating Systems, Inc., Triad Mechanical Company, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Submitted (Teske, Christopher)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (Teske, Christopher)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Teske, Christopher)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Teske, Christopher)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Teske, Christopher)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Teske, Christopher)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher R. Teske (Teske, Christopher)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Endurance American Insurance Company. The Roof Depot 002, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Teske, Christopher)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 6/11/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 5/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/9/2020. (SGO)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2092754.), filed by Endurance American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Teske, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endurance American Insurance Company v. ABG Caulking Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endurance American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Teske
Represented By: Lindsey Soboul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roof Depot 002, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABG Caulking Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Masonry, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Coating Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD&M, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Mechanical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caragher, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Caulking Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Coating Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?