Safranek et al v. Nat'l Gen'l Ins. Co. et al
Plaintiff: David Safranek and Darci Safranek
Defendant: Melvin Green IV, National General Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00198
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 34 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2021 is CANCELED at this time pending review of the #33 Joint Status Report. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 8, 2021 Filing 33 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
June 8, 2021 Filing 32 R. Doc. 32 no longer exists. Entered in error by case manager. (This is is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) Modified on 6/8/2021 (BLR).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/8/2021. (BLR)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULING AND ORDER Adopting #28 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs #16 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Plaintiffs request to sever and remand non-class claims is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/12/2021. (KMW)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Voluntary Partial Dismissal, all claims against Defendant Melvin Green, IV are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/2/2021. (SWE)
February 25, 2021 Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Darci Safranek, David Safranek. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that the #16 Motion to Remand, filed by Plaintiffs Bruce David Andrew Safranek and Darci Felder Safranek, individually, and on behalf of their minor children, be DENIED as the Notice of Removal was timely filed, the requirements of CAFA have been established, and none of the CAFA abstention exceptions are inapplicable. Plaintiffs' request to sever and remand non-class claims be DENIED. In the event this Recommendation is adopted, that the matter be referred for a scheduling conference. Objections to R&R due by 3/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/25/2021. (EDC)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 MOTION to Substitute Voluntary Order of Dismissal filed by Darci Safranek, David Safranek. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/17/2020. (KMW)
June 30, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Motion and Order for Voluntary Partial Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit incorrect Motion, #2 Exhibit incorrect Order, #3 Exhibit corrected Motion, #4 Exhibit corrected Order, #5 Proposed Pleading; Order Granting Substitution)(Manning, Joseph)
June 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Voluntary Partial Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order of Voluntary Partial Dismissal)(Manning, Joseph) Modified on 6/30/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Main Document 25 replaced on 7/20/2020 in accordance with record document 27) (KMW).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Brian A. Richie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: As referenced in the Court's 22 June 16, 2020 Order, Plaintiffs David and Darci Safranek's claims against Defendants Imperial Fire and Casualty Ins. Co. ("Imperial") and National General Ins. Co. ("National General") were dismissed with prejudice by order of the 19th Judicial District Court on May 15, 2019, nearly a year before removal of the case to this Court. See R. Doc. 21-2, p. 2. No party has filed a Notice indicating an opposition to the termination of Imperial and National General. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Imperial Fire and Casualty Ins. Co. and National General Ins. Co. are TERMINATED as defendants in this proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE AND ORDER: The pleadings attached to the #21 Motion for Byron A. Richie to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Imperial Fire and Casualty Ins. Co. ("Imperial") and National General Ins. Co. ("National General") reflect that Plaintiffs' claims against Imperial and National General were dismissed with prejudice by order of the 19th Judicial District Court on May 15, 2019, nearly a year before removal of the case to this Court. See R. Doc. 21-2, p. 2. Accordingly, by no later than June 19, 2020, any party who opposes the termination of Imperial and National General as defendants in this matter shall file a Notice with the Court indicating their opposition. If no opposition is timely filed, Imperial and National General shall be terminated as defendants in this suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
June 15, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION for Byron A. Richie to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 11, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Byron A. Richie to Withdraw as Attorney by Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, National General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit)(Richie, Byron)
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #16 MOTION to Remand filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Gregory Moroux, Jr., #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Leigh Creasman)(Grant, Ashlee)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #16 MOTION to Remand. For good cause shown, USAA Casualty Insurance Company's response to the Motion to Remand shall be filed by no later than June 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/08/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
May 8, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #16 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #16 MOTION to Remand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response)(Grant, Ashlee)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #16 Motion to Remand, the Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 is CANCELED. No status report is due at this time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 4, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: In light of the #14 Answer filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA's #7 Motion for Extension is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/9/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 8, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental and Amending Petition by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Grant, Ashlee)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions for Michael Edward Mumford and Anthony Bernard Ponikvar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 8, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Michael Edward Mumford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2098749). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
April 8, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Anthony Bernard Ponikvar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2098754). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Anthony Bernard Ponikvar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2098754) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Certification of Anthony Bernard Ponikvar, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Oath of Anthony Bernard Ponikvar, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Grant, Ashlee)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Michael Edward Mumford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2098749) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Certification of Michael Edward Mumford, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Oath of Michael Edward Mumford, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Grant, Ashlee)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/14/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/6/2020. (KMW)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before April 8, 2020, Plaintiffs David and Darci Safranek shall file a Notice with the Court indicating whether Plaintiff opposes the #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental and Amending Petition filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. In the event Plaintiffs oppose the Motion for Extension, Plaintiffs opposition shall be filed within normal briefing delays. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Substitute Case Caption and Notice of Removal. The clerk shall replace R. Doc. 1 with 6-1 pp. 2-7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 3, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental and Amending Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental and Amending Petition by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order)(Grant, Ashlee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Case Caption and Notice of Removal by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment proposed Order)(Grant, Ashlee)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Attorney William C. Rower regarding Leonard Penzo who is Co-Counsel for party David Safranek and Darci Safranek, individually and on behalf of their children, Evan Safranek and Elise Safranek. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney Byron A. Riche regarding Patrick Woolbert who is Co-Counsel for party National General Insurance Company and Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
April 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Substitute Case Caption and Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA for USAA Casualty Insurance Company.. (Grant, Ashlee)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal by USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Grant, Ashlee)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Court of East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 665835. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2096501), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1 thru D-7, #5 Exhibit D-8, #6 Exhibit D-9 thru D-22, #7 Exhibit D-23 thru D-40, #8 Exhibit D-41 thru D-42, #9 Exhibit D-43 thru D-63, #10 Exhibit D-64 thru D-67, #11 Exhibit D-68 thru D-81, #12 Exhibit D-82 thru D-90, #13 Exhibit D-91 thru D-94, #14 Exhibit D-95 thru D-100, #15 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Grant, Ashlee) (Attachment 8-11 and 14 replaced on 4/2/2020 to edit page orientation) (LT). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/7/2020 pursuant to rec. doc. 8) (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safranek et al v. Nat'l Gen'l Ins. Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Safranek
Represented By: Joseph Stanier Manning
Represented By: William C. Rowe, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan E Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darci Safranek
Represented By: Joseph Stanier Manning
Represented By: William C. Rowe, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan E Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Green IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Insurance Company
Represented By: Byron A. Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Kent Moroux, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlee Cassman Grant
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Anthony Bernard Ponikvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Byron A. Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?