Williams v. State of Louisiana and Its Subdivision, The Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Latiasha Smith Williams
Defendant: John Doe(s), Warden Robert Tanner, Sergeant John Crain, James LeBlanc, Sergeant Gary King, Captain Hillman Brink, State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Sergeant Dustin Rogers, John Crain, State of Louisiana and Its Subdivision, The Louisana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Robert Tanner, Gary King, Brink Hillman and Dustin Rogers
Case Number: 3:2020cv00212
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 Return on Electronic Transfer from Eastern District of Louisiana. (SWE)
April 8, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Eastern District of Louisiana. (ELW)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (ELW)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/08/2020. (ELW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Brink Hillman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Phayer, Dennis)
April 8, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Gary King. (Giambrone, Guice)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Guice A. Giambrone III regarding Jacob K. Best who is Co-Counsel for party Gary King. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-694434. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2098609), filed by Robert Tanner, James LeBlanc, State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Krouse, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. State of Louisiana and Its Subdivision, The Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert Tanner
Represented By: Allen J. Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant John Crain
Represented By: Darren A. Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Represented By: Allen J. Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Gary King
Represented By: Guice A. Giambrone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hillman Brink
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Allen J. Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dustin Rogers
Represented By: Davis Bradford Allgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crain
Represented By: Darren A. Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana and Its Subdivision, The Louisana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Allen J. Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tanner
Represented By: Allen J. Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary King
Represented By: Guice A. Giambrone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brink Hillman
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Rogers
Represented By: Davis Bradford Allgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latiasha Smith Williams
Represented By: Ron S. Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?