Ard v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Ard
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan plc, Cardinal Health, Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis, Inc., INSYS Therapeutics, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Actavis LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc. and Noramco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00459
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 Return on Electronic Transfer from Northern District of Ohio. (SWE)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Ohio Northern. (ELW)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ELW)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (EDC)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Served Defendants McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., without waiver of any defenses, shall have up to, through and including 30 days after the later of (1) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, should any party file one, or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the Conditional Transfer Order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL, whichever is later, to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/24/2020. (SWE)
July 22, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Williams, Stacey)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cephalon, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACUETICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD, Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon, Inc.. (Crisler, Richard)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Supplemental Notice of Removal by Cephalon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crisler, Richard) Modified on 7/22/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case. (EDC)
July 15, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District, Case Number 167158. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2141516), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cove Sheet, #2 Attachment Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(Williams, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ard v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc
Represented By: Franklin J Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry A. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: William Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry A. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris and Dickson Co., LLC
Represented By: Franklin Harris Spruiell, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Reginald Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ard
Represented By: Eric L. Pittman
Represented By: Hannah Elayne Honeycutt
Represented By: Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?