Montgomery v. Credit One Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Monique Montgomery
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.a.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00468
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Meyer, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims by Credit One Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(LLH)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Substitute Doc. 7 - Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law. The proposed pleadings accompanying Defendants #8 Motion shall be entered into the docket as a separate entry and deemed timely filed. Defendants original 7 Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Dismiss And Supporting Memorandum Of Law is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/27/2020. (LLH)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Doc. 7 - Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Gary Harwood, #4 Exhibit 2 - AAA Rule 14, #5 Exhibit 3 - JAMS Rule 11)(Meyer, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Harwood, # 2 Exhibit 2 - AAA Rule 14, # 3 Exhibit 3 - JAMS Rule 11)(Meyer, Christopher). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 8/21/2020 (EDC). Modified on 8/27/2020 to remove document as it has been stricken by Order #9 (LLH).
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Meyer, Christopher)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Monique Montgomery (KMW) Modified on 8/14/2020 to edit the event type (KMW).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/28/2020. (SGO)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit One Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Credit One Financial for Credit One Bank, N.A... (Meyer, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Credit One Bank, N.A..(Meyer, Christopher)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baton Rouge City Court, Case Number 20-00505 C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2142525), filed by Credit One Bank, N.a.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyer, Christopher) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2020) (EDC). Modified on 7/17/2020 to flatten document. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Credit One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.a.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?