Ferrara et al v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies et al
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Ferrara and Biloxi Boardwalk Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, BXS Insurance, Inc. and Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2020cv00472
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/9/2020. (SWE)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 11/11/2020. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/15/2020. Discovery due by 4/19/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 3/19/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 4/19/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 4/19/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 5/19/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 6/18/2021. Motions shall be filed by 7/16/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2022 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 1/24/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 1/3/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 2/7/2022. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 to 2/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/9/2020. (SWE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Frederick, Brent) Modified on 9/3/2020 to edit text(LLH).
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by BXS Insurance, Inc..(Clark, James)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Ace American Insurance Company.(Prince, Thomas)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. ACEAmerican Insurance Company responsive pleading are due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dismiss. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, and Chubb National Insurance Company, are hereby voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/23/2020. (EDC)
July 23, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prince, Thomas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Biloxi Boardwalk Holdings, LLC, Christopher A. Ferrara (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order on Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(Frederick, Brent) Modified on 7/23/2020 to correct event type. (EDC).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/21/2020. (ELW)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 697418. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2144006), filed by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Engelhardt, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrara et al v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Represented By: Adelaida J. Ferchmin
Represented By: Thomas Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BXS Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L. Barbre
Represented By: Weston Joseph Clark
Represented By: James Wendell Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Ferrara
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Goren
Represented By: Michael T. Beckers
Represented By: Brent Paul Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biloxi Boardwalk Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Goren
Represented By: Michael T. Beckers
Represented By: Brent Paul Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?