Wallace v. Illinois Central Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Conrhone Wallace
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Not Classified By Court: Claire B. Deason
Case Number: 3:2020cv00516
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 29 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 and #26 Motions to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorneys Meghan Elizabeth Ruckman and Matthew Arthur Sherman for Plaintiff Conrhone Wallace. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 1, 2020 Filing 27 Joint STATUS REPORT by Illinois Central Railroad Company. (Christensen, Corey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Enroll Matthew Sherman as Attorney by Conrhone Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Ruckman, Meghan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Enroll Meghan Ruckman as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Ruckman, Meghan)
October 1, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #26 MOTION to Enroll Matthew Sherman as Attorney , #25 MOTION to Enroll Meghan Ruckman as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 and #22 Motions for Holly M. Robbins and Corey J. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illinois Central Railroad Company re #19 Answer to Complaint (Belsome, Bradley)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Corey J. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2161569) by Illinois Central Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Belsome, Bradley) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/25/2020) (EDC). Modified on 8/25/2020 to rotate pages. (EDC). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/26/2020 in order to correct document. (EDC).
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Holly M. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2161556) by Illinois Central Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Belsome, Bradley) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/25/2020) (EDC). Modified on 8/25/2020 to rotate pages. (EDC).
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Illinois Central Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Grand Trunk Corporation, Corporate Parent Illinois Central Corporation, Corporate Parent North American Railways Inc, Corporate Parent CN Financial Services VIII LLC, Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway Company for Illinois Central Railroad Company.. (Belsome, Bradley)
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Illinois Central Railroad Company.(Belsome, Bradley) Modified on 8/25/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 25, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Corey J. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2161569), #21 MOTION for Holly M. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2161556). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/17/2020. (BLR)
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred in from the Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00159. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 12, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Granting #15 AGREED MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of Louisiana. ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court - Middle District of Louisiana. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Middle District of Louisiana. Case transferred electronically....***Case terminated on 8/10/20., filed. (sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 AGREED MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of Louisiana by Conrhone Wallace, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(agould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by D' Arwyn K. Daniels on behalf of Conrhone Wallace, filed. (agould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle K. Herring on behalf of Illinois Central Railroad Company, filed. (Herring, Danielle) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Cancelling Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Abate by Conrhone Wallace, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2020. (Poncio, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam Poncio terminated.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Corey Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Holly Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Poncio Law Offices, P.C. and DK Law PLLC to Withdraw as Attorney by Conrhone Wallace, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2020. (Poncio, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue by Illinois Central Railroad Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corey J. Christensen with exhibits 1-5, #2 Declaration of Jody Evely)(Deason, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Corey J. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Illinois Central Railroad Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2020. (Deason, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Holly M. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Illinois Central Railroad Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2020. (Deason, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Illinois Central Railroad Company served on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020, filed.(Poncio, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23960926) filed by CONRHONE WALLACE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poncio, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Illinois Central Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrhone Wallace
Represented By: Matthew Arthur Sherman
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Ruckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Claire B. Deason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Represented By: Corey J Christensen
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Bradley R. Belsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?