Wilde et al v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dean Wilde and Karen Wilde
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company and Carl Roberts, III doing business as CWR Trucking
Case Number: 3:2020cv00525
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Wilde, Dean Wilde. Carl Roberts, III served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Meredith, Collins)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Wilde, Dean Wilde. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Meredith, Collins)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/24/2020. (KAH)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Substitute Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
August 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Meredith, Collins)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: Regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal in this matter to comply with Local Rule 10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KAH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Carl Roberts, III. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-2156791.), filed by Karen Wilde, Dean Wilde. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons)(Meredith, Collins) (Attachments 2 and 3 replaced on 8/18/2020 to flatten the summons) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/20/2020 in accordance with RD 5) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilde et al v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Wilde
Represented By: Mitchell Locke Meredith
Represented By: Curtis Locke Meredith, Jr.
Represented By: Sean Duvall Fagan
Represented By: Collins Locke Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Wilde
Represented By: Mitchell Locke Meredith
Represented By: Curtis Locke Meredith, Jr.
Represented By: Sean Duvall Fagan
Represented By: Collins Locke Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Roberts, III doing business as CWR Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?