Autin v. Cherokee Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Autin
Defendant: Darius Savage, Central Hauling Co. and Cherokee Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00528
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 is CANCELED pending evaluation of subject matter jurisdiction (R. Doc. #2 ). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Ryan Autin. (Andrews, Brandon)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, Darius Savage.(Remondet, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Hauling Co. (Remondet, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cherokee Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Oakland Financial Corporation for Cherokee Insurance Company. (Remondet, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, Darius Savage with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit -Certificate of Entire State Court Record, #2 Attachment Certified State Court Record)(Remondet, Michael) Modified on 9/11/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED Medical Records filed by Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, Darius Savage. (LLH)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 SEALED Motion for Leave to File Ex Parte Motion to File Medical Records Under Seal and #9 Ex Parte Motion to File Medical Records Under Seal. The clerk is directed to file Exhibit A under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/1/2020. (LLH)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED Ex Parte Motion to File Medical Records Under Seal by Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, Darius Savage. (LLH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Ex Parte Motion to File Medical Records Under Seal by Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, Darius Savage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A - 1006 Summary, Medicals)(Remondet, Michael) Modified on 8/31/2020 to edit text (LLH).
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Diversity Jurisdiction regarding #2 Notice and Order filed by Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, Darius Savage. (Remondet, Michael) Modified on 8/28/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 25, 2020 *** Set Deadlines/Hearings: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (NLT)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/25/2020. (EDC) Modified on 9/28/2020 (NLT).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and RULING: The #4 Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/21/2020. (ELW)
August 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to #2 Notice and Order MOTION for Limited Discovery on Issue of Jurisdictional Amount. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to #2 Notice and Order and for Limited Discovery on Issue of Jurisdictional Amount by Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, Darius Savage. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of No Opposition, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Remondet, Michael) Modified on 8/20/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Ryan Autin (Andrews, Brandon) Modified on 8/19/2020 to edit text (LLH).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: By 8/31/2020, Defendants Darius Savage, Central Hauling Co., and Cherokee Insurance Company shall file a memorandum and support evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met. By 9/10/2020, Plaintiff Ryan Autin shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Defendants have established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332, or (2) a Motion to Remand. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/19/2020. (SWE) Modified on 8/20/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC, WBR Parish, Case Number 1046133. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2157061), filed by Darius Savage, Central Hauling Co., Cherokee Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order, #3 Affidavit /Verification, #4 Exhibit A-Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit B - Notice of Service on Cherokee, #6 Exhibit C - Notice of Service on Central Hauling, #7 Exhibit D - Notice of Service on Savage, #8 Exhibit E - state crt Notive of Filing Removal)(Remondet, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autin v. Cherokee Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darius Savage
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Hauling Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Represented By: Juliette Busby Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Autin
Represented By: Brandon Scott Andrews
Represented By: Charles Scott Courrege
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?