Tanner v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Wayne Tanner
Defendant: Richland Parish Detention Center, East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, Sid Goutreaux, III, Correct Health, LaSalle Corrections and Gary Gilley
Case Number: 3:2020cv00530
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
August 17, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (SWE)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01649. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS ORDERED that the Title 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint filed by Joseph Wayne Tanner is transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending motion to proceed as a pauper is deferred for the transferee court's consideration. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/14/2020.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #8 Complaint and #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Wayne Tanner. RECOMMENDED that the captioned matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the pending motion to proceed as a pauper (rec. doc. #9 ) be DEFERRED to the transferee court for consideration. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 7/20/2020. (dw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Wayne Tanner. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Original IFP)(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Correct Health, East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, Gary Gilley, Sid Goutreaux, III, LaSalle Corrections, Richland Parish Detention Center filed by Joseph Wayne Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Original Complaint, #2 Original Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint)(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SECOND DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #5 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/13/2020. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Wayne Tanner. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/1/2020. (pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Correct Health, East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, LaSalle Corrections, Richland Parish Detention Center filed by Joseph Wayne Tanner.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Wayne Tanner. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT**COMPLAINT against Correct Health, East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, Gary Gilley, Sid Goutreaux, III, LaSalle Corrections filed by Joseph Wayne Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Goutreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wayne Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?