Dedman v. Unum Group
Plaintiff: Frank Dedman
Defendant: Unum Group and Providence Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00534
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to Dismiss without prejudice, Defendant, Unum Group. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company be substituted as the proper defendant. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/15/2020. (SWE)
October 15, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Unum Group. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (ELW)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Frank Dedman. (Boxill, Brent) Modified on 10/15/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
October 15, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Unum Group. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Unum Group by Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Welch, Lauren)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Unum Group.(Welch, Lauren)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/11/2020. (EDC)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of List of Parties and Pleadings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(a) and Certificate of Counsel by Unum Group (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(Welch, Lauren) Modified on 8/20/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unum Group. (Welch, Lauren)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC, Case Number 129171. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2157741), filed by Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welch, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dedman v. Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Lauren A. Welch
Represented By: Kristen Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren A. Welch
Represented By: Kristen Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Dedman
Represented By: Brent Barber Boxill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?