Palmer v. Hooper et al
Petitioner: Pharoah Palmer
Respondent: Jeff Landry and Tim Hooper
Case Number: 3:2020cv00543
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Petitioner shall pay the filing fee of $5.00 to the Clerk of this Court. The filing fee must be paid as a single payment. No partial payments will be accepted. Filing Fee due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/24/2020. (EDC)
August 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 18, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Pharoah Palmer. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(KMW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Pharoah Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Hooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pharoah Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?