Dudley v. Landry
Petitioner: Clarence Dudley
Respondent: Attorney General Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2020cv00578
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/08/2019. (ELW)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 JUDGMENT : The action is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/11/2020. (ELW) Modified on 9/17/2020 to edit file date (ELW).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULING and ORDER: Regarding #1 MOTION for Extension of Time to File PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/11/2020. (ELW)
September 3, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #1 MOTION for Extension of Time to File PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 31, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Extension of Time to File PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clarence Dudley.(KMW) Modified on 9/3/2020 to edit the event type (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clarence Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?