Beals v. Vannoy et al
Petitioner: Cecil Beals
Respondent: Jeff Landry and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2020cv00579
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 There is no record document 7. Entered in error by the Case Administrator. Modified on 10/23/2020 to edit text and remove the document. (EDC).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of Ascension shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 23rd Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 23rd Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of Ascension, and the Clerk of Court for 23rd Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/6/2020. ( #1 Fed-Ex Shipment Receipts) (LLH).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, filed by Petitioner Cecil Beals, is DENIED AS MOOT, as Petitioner has paid the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
October 6, 2020 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Cecil Beals #211347 in the amount of $5.00. Transaction posted on 10/1/2020. Receipt number 4699030509 processed by eclement. (IJE)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attempt to Pay the Filing Fee by Cecil Beals (KMW)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Filing Fee and Statement of Account due by 10/1/2020. (EDC)
September 3, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cecil Beals. (KMW)
September 3, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Cecil Beals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Cover Letter)(KMW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #5 Exhibit) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beals v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cecil Beals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?