Warner v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: T'Shyra Warner
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00590
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/23/2020. (SWE)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2020. Discovery due by 6/25/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 3/26/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 4/30/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 4/23/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 6/4/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 8/13/2021. Motions shall be filed by 9/10/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 1/28/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 2/11/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 3/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 to 3/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/23/2020. (SWE)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall confer to discuss a settlement that resolves all claims in this matter (including attorney fees) and shall file a joint notice with regard to the status of settlement negotiations by no later than December 1, 2020. The joint notice shall not contain any specific information regarding amounts of settlement demands or responses, but should outline any impediments to settlement. The joint notice shall be limited to three pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by T'Shyra Warner. (Lambremont, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc..(Mihelick, Travis) Modified on 10/7/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Notice of Appearance (R. Doc. 7) is hereby STRICKEN from the record. J. Travis Mihelic has already been admitted as counsel of record, see R. Doc. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
September 27, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD NOTICE of Appearance of J. Travis Mihelick by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. (Mihelick, Travis) Modified on 10/2/2020 to remove document in accordance with RD 8 (SWE).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a). Responsive pleadings for G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. due 10/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(EWD)
September 14, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gauthier, Camille)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for J. Travis Mihelick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/10/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/15/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/9/2020. (LLH)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for J. Travis Mihelick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2168691) by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Gauthier, Camille)
September 9, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for J. Travis Mihelick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2168691). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-698835. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2168263), filed by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Filing Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record)(Gauthier, Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Camille Elise Gauthier
Represented By: Sean P. Brady
Represented By: Travis Mihelick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T'Shyra Warner
Represented By: John B. Lambremont, Sr.
Represented By: Paul B. Lambremont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?